California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB892 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2018

Amended

Bill July 2, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018