|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 5223.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 6144.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4877.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|