California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018