|
09/21/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5956.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 6734.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5085.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4884.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|