California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB917 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill May 1, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018