|
07/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5027.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4813.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|