California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB925 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2018

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill July 20, 2018

Amended

Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018