|
09/29/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 6409.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4299.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4813.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 24 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4813.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|