LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB926
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB926
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB926
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 24, 2018
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 23, 2018
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 20, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 25, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 30, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 12, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 3, 2018
Compare