|
09/13/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 6051.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 6803.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4300.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|