California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018