|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 6126.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 35. Page 7052.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 31. Page 6732.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4226.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4995.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|