California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill May 16, 2018