|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 6135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6961.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4300.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4904.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4810.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|