California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 21, 2018
Bill May 7, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018