California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB966 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018
Bill April 10, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018