|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 932, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5872.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6585.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4814.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4588.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|