California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB981 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018