Senate | 05/02/2018 | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | May 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |