Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 1022.) (May 9). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 623.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., T. & H., and RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |