Senate | 04/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4647.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4354.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |