1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 104 CHAPTER 40Relative to National Nutrition Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 104, Hertzberg. National Nutrition Month.This measure would declare the month of March 2018 as National Nutrition Month and would encourage citizens to seek nutritional education.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics, which is the worlds largest organization of food and nutrition professionals, and its state affiliate, the California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics, are promoting nutrition awareness as part of National Nutrition Month, with the theme of Go Further with Food; andWHEREAS, Initiated in March 1973 as a week-long event, National Nutrition Week became a month-long observance in 1980 in response to growing public interest in nutrition; andWHEREAS, Go Further with Food is the theme for 2018, and its importance is timely for many reasons. Whether it is starting the day off right with a healthy breakfast or fueling before an athletic event, the foods you choose can make a difference. Preparing foods to go further at home and within the community can have a positive impact as well; andWHEREAS, As nutrition experts, members of the Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics can help people adopt healthier eating styles, while reducing food loss and waste; andWHEREAS, The California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics is a not-for-profit membership association of approximately 6,500 registered dietitian nutritionists (RDNs), nutrition dietetic technicians, registered (NDTRs), and students committed to improving Californias health and advancing the profession of dietetics through research, education, and advocacy; andWHEREAS, The vision of the California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics is to optimize Californias health through food and nutrition, and the mission of the academy is to empower members to be Californias science- and evidence-based food and nutrition leaders; andWHEREAS, Educated and credentialed nutritionists trained in evidence-based practice provide medical nutrition therapy for the prevention and treatment of chronic diseases afflicting the American population, including, among others, diabetes, obesity, heart disease, and renal disease; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the month of March 2018 as National Nutrition Month and encourages citizens to seek nutritional education; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 13, 2018 Passed IN Senate March 12, 2018 Passed IN Assembly April 12, 2018 Amended IN Senate February 27, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 104Introduced by Senator HertzbergFebruary 16, 2018Relative to National Nutrition Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 104, Hertzberg. National Nutrition Month.This measure would declare the month of March 2018 as National Nutrition Month and would encourage citizens to seek nutritional education.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics, which is the worlds largest organization of food and nutrition professionals, and its state affiliate, the California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics, are promoting nutrition awareness as part of National Nutrition Month, with the theme of Go Further with Food; andWHEREAS, Initiated in March 1973 as a week-long event, National Nutrition Week became a month-long observance in 1980 in response to growing public interest in nutrition; andWHEREAS, Go Further with Food is the theme for 2018, and its importance is timely for many reasons. Whether it is starting the day off right with a healthy breakfast or fueling before an athletic event, the foods you choose can make a difference. Preparing foods to go further at home and within the community can have a positive impact as well; andWHEREAS, As nutrition experts, members of the Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics can help people adopt healthier eating styles, while reducing food loss and waste; andWHEREAS, The California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics is a not-for-profit membership association of approximately 6,500 registered dietitian nutritionists (RDNs), nutrition dietetic technicians, registered (NDTRs), and students committed to improving Californias health and advancing the profession of dietetics through research, education, and advocacy; andWHEREAS, The vision of the California Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics is to optimize Californias health through food and nutrition, and the mission of the academy is to empower members to be Californias science- and evidence-based food and nutrition leaders; andWHEREAS, Educated and credentialed nutritionists trained in evidence-based practice provide medical nutrition therapy for the prevention and treatment of chronic diseases afflicting the American population, including, among others, diabetes, obesity, heart disease, and renal disease; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the month of March 2018 as National Nutrition Month and encourages citizens to seek nutritional education; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|