Senate | 05/10/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4966.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4902.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4562.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |