California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2018

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2018

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2018

Amended

Bill April 19, 2018
Bill March 19, 2018