Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4832.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|