Senate | 07/10/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5024.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2018 | June 12 hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4998.) (May 8). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |