Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 128 CHAPTER 125Relative to the American flag. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 128, Nguyen. American flag.This measure would declare that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty, would call upon the state and local government to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, and would recognize June 14, 2018, as Flag Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, On June 14, 1777, in the midst of the American Revolutionary War, the Continental Congress adopted a resolution stating that the flag of the United States be thirteen alternate stripes red and white and that the Union be thirteen stars, white in a blue field, representing a new Constellation; and WHEREAS, On September 14, 1814, American soldiers under siege at Fort McHenry in Baltimore, Maryland raised a huge American flag to celebrate a crucial victory over British forces during the War of 1812, inspiring Francis Scott Key to write a poem that eventually became the words of the United States National Anthem; and WHEREAS, On June 6, 1944, more than 160,000 American and Allied troops carrying the Stars and Stripes landed along a 50-mile stretch of heavily fortified French coastline in Normandy to liberate Europe from the forces of Nazi Germany. More than 9,000 Allied soldiers were killed or wounded on D-Day to free Europe from fascist occupation; and WHEREAS, On February 23, 1945, five Marines and a Navy Corpsman raised the American flag atop Mount Suribachi during the Battle of Iwo Jima. It was a hard-fought victory over imperialism at the cost of 5,900 United States service members killed and 17,400 wounded against 23,000 Japanese army and naval forces fighting from an entrenched network of caves, dugouts, tunnels, and underground installations; and WHEREAS, On July 20, 1969, astronauts Neil Armstrong and Buzz Aldrin became the first human beings to set foot on the surface of the moon, where they placed the American flag. There, the flag has stood a decades-long vigil upon the Sea of Tranquility as a gesture of peace for all humankind; and WHEREAS, On September 11, 2001, in the aftermath of the terrorist attack which destroyed the World Trade Center, three New York City firefighters, George Johnson of Rockaway Beach, Ladder 157, Dan McWilliams of Long Island, Ladder 157, and Billy Eisengrein of Staten Island, Rescue 2, raised the American flag over the smoldering ruins of Ground Zero where the Twin Towers once stood. It was an act of defiance against those who sought to break the unconquerable values of freedom and liberty which the American flag represents; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature calls upon the state and local governments to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, including, but not limited to, public schools, public colleges, public universities, state beaches, public parks, public monuments, museums, and government offices; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes National Flag Day on June 14, 2018, and encourages all Californians to celebrate the occasion with appropriate activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 128 CHAPTER 125Relative to the American flag. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 128, Nguyen. American flag.This measure would declare that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty, would call upon the state and local government to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, and would recognize June 14, 2018, as Flag Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 128 CHAPTER 125 Relative to the American flag. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 128, Nguyen. American flag. This measure would declare that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty, would call upon the state and local government to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, and would recognize June 14, 2018, as Flag Day. This measure would declare that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty, would call upon the state and local government to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, and would recognize June 14, 2018, as Flag Day. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, On June 14, 1777, in the midst of the American Revolutionary War, the Continental Congress adopted a resolution stating that the flag of the United States be thirteen alternate stripes red and white and that the Union be thirteen stars, white in a blue field, representing a new Constellation; and WHEREAS, On September 14, 1814, American soldiers under siege at Fort McHenry in Baltimore, Maryland raised a huge American flag to celebrate a crucial victory over British forces during the War of 1812, inspiring Francis Scott Key to write a poem that eventually became the words of the United States National Anthem; and WHEREAS, On June 6, 1944, more than 160,000 American and Allied troops carrying the Stars and Stripes landed along a 50-mile stretch of heavily fortified French coastline in Normandy to liberate Europe from the forces of Nazi Germany. More than 9,000 Allied soldiers were killed or wounded on D-Day to free Europe from fascist occupation; and WHEREAS, On February 23, 1945, five Marines and a Navy Corpsman raised the American flag atop Mount Suribachi during the Battle of Iwo Jima. It was a hard-fought victory over imperialism at the cost of 5,900 United States service members killed and 17,400 wounded against 23,000 Japanese army and naval forces fighting from an entrenched network of caves, dugouts, tunnels, and underground installations; and WHEREAS, On July 20, 1969, astronauts Neil Armstrong and Buzz Aldrin became the first human beings to set foot on the surface of the moon, where they placed the American flag. There, the flag has stood a decades-long vigil upon the Sea of Tranquility as a gesture of peace for all humankind; and WHEREAS, On September 11, 2001, in the aftermath of the terrorist attack which destroyed the World Trade Center, three New York City firefighters, George Johnson of Rockaway Beach, Ladder 157, Dan McWilliams of Long Island, Ladder 157, and Billy Eisengrein of Staten Island, Rescue 2, raised the American flag over the smoldering ruins of Ground Zero where the Twin Towers once stood. It was an act of defiance against those who sought to break the unconquerable values of freedom and liberty which the American flag represents; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares that the American flag represents the values of freedom and liberty; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature calls upon the state and local governments to prohibit any government entity in the state from banning the American flag from public property, including, but not limited to, public schools, public colleges, public universities, state beaches, public parks, public monuments, museums, and government offices; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes National Flag Day on June 14, 2018, and encourages all Californians to celebrate the occasion with appropriate activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.