Senate | 02/24/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 246.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 375.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 112.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |