California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR13 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 13 CHAPTER 11Relative to Lunar New Year Celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 24, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 13, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, January 28, 2017, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; andWHEREAS, California is home to over 5 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Native Hawaiian, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 1.7 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rooster and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 28, 2017, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled February 22, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 21, 2017 Passed IN Assembly February 17, 2017 Amended IN Assembly February 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 13Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Nguyen)January 04, 2017Relative to Lunar New Year Celebration.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 13, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, January 28, 2017, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; andWHEREAS, California is home to over 5 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Native Hawaiian, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 1.7 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rooster and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 28, 2017, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 13 CHAPTER 11Relative to Lunar New Year Celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 24, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 13, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled February 22, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 21, 2017 Passed IN Assembly February 17, 2017 Amended IN Assembly February 06, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 13Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Nguyen)January 04, 2017Relative to Lunar New Year Celebration.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 13, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled February 22, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 21, 2017 Passed IN Assembly February 17, 2017 Amended IN Assembly February 06, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled February 22, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate February 21, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly February 17, 2017
10+Amended IN Assembly February 06, 2017
11+
12+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
413
514 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 13
6-CHAPTER 11
15+
16+Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Nguyen)January 04, 2017
17+
18+Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Nguyen)
19+January 04, 2017
720
821 Relative to Lunar New Year Celebration.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State February 24, 2017. ]
1122
1223 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1324
1425 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1526
1627 SCR 13, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration.
1728
1829 This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.
1930
2031 This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration on January 28, 2017.
2132
2233 ## Digest Key
2334
2435 ## Bill Text
2536
2637 WHEREAS, January 28, 2017, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; and
2738
2839 WHEREAS, California is home to over 5 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Native Hawaiian, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and
2940
3041 WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and
3142
3243 WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 1.7 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and
3344
3445 WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rooster and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; and
3546
3647 WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it
3748
3849 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 28, 2017, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further
3950
4051 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.