Senate | 09/04/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 6477.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 4815.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |