California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR139 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139 CHAPTER 183 Relative to No Straw November. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 04, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California values the health of its ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, California is a global leader in taking action to protect the health of the ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, Plastic pollution poses a significant threat to the health of Californias ocean resources and coastal environment, and to the publics enjoyment of that environment; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws pose a health risk to ocean wildlife when accidentally ingested; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws are frequently littered or dropped by individuals, escape from waste management systems, and can get deposited onto the beach and washed into storm drains, streams, rivers, and eventually the ocean; andWHEREAS, Reducing consumption of plastic straws can help decrease plastic pollution in the ocean and Californias coastal environment; andWHEREAS, Recognizing the negative environmental impact of plastic straws, many restaurants and other establishments in California and around the United States have voluntarily stopped providing plastic straws; andWHEREAS, Customers should be encouraged to make informed choices when considering ways to reduce their impacts on the environment; andWHEREAS, The California State Senate recognizes the efforts of Girl Scout Shelby ONeil, the founder of Jr Ocean Guardians, to raise awareness about the problem of ocean plastic, and to reduce pollution from plastic straws by starting the No Straw November initiative; andWHEREAS, In the No Straw November initiative, participants pledge to refuse straws for the month of November; andWHEREAS, Shelby ONeil attributes her love of the ocean and founding of Jr Ocean Guardians to her service as a Teen Conservation Leader at Monterey Bay Aquarium; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of November shall be recognized as No Straw November; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California and to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled August 29, 2018 Passed IN Senate June 21, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018 Relative to No Straw November. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California values the health of its ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, California is a global leader in taking action to protect the health of the ocean and coast; andWHEREAS, Plastic pollution poses a significant threat to the health of Californias ocean resources and coastal environment, and to the publics enjoyment of that environment; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws pose a health risk to ocean wildlife when accidentally ingested; andWHEREAS, Plastic straws are frequently littered or dropped by individuals, escape from waste management systems, and can get deposited onto the beach and washed into storm drains, streams, rivers, and eventually the ocean; andWHEREAS, Reducing consumption of plastic straws can help decrease plastic pollution in the ocean and Californias coastal environment; andWHEREAS, Recognizing the negative environmental impact of plastic straws, many restaurants and other establishments in California and around the United States have voluntarily stopped providing plastic straws; andWHEREAS, Customers should be encouraged to make informed choices when considering ways to reduce their impacts on the environment; andWHEREAS, The California State Senate recognizes the efforts of Girl Scout Shelby ONeil, the founder of Jr Ocean Guardians, to raise awareness about the problem of ocean plastic, and to reduce pollution from plastic straws by starting the No Straw November initiative; andWHEREAS, In the No Straw November initiative, participants pledge to refuse straws for the month of November; andWHEREAS, Shelby ONeil attributes her love of the ocean and founding of Jr Ocean Guardians to her service as a Teen Conservation Leader at Monterey Bay Aquarium; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of November shall be recognized as No Straw November; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California and to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139 CHAPTER 183 Relative to No Straw November. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 04, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled August 29, 2018 Passed IN Senate June 21, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018 Relative to No Straw November. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled August 29, 2018 Passed IN Senate June 21, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018
6+
7+Enrolled August 29, 2018
8+Passed IN Senate June 21, 2018
9+Passed IN Assembly August 23, 2018
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 139
6-CHAPTER 183
14+
15+Introduced by Senator MonningApril 30, 2018
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Monning
18+April 30, 2018
719
820 Relative to No Straw November.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 04, 2018. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 139, Monning. No Straw November.
1727
1828 This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.
1929
2030 This measure would proclaim the month of November as No Straw November.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, California values the health of its ocean and coast; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, California is a global leader in taking action to protect the health of the ocean and coast; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, Plastic pollution poses a significant threat to the health of Californias ocean resources and coastal environment, and to the publics enjoyment of that environment; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Plastic straws pose a health risk to ocean wildlife when accidentally ingested; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, Plastic straws are frequently littered or dropped by individuals, escape from waste management systems, and can get deposited onto the beach and washed into storm drains, streams, rivers, and eventually the ocean; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, Reducing consumption of plastic straws can help decrease plastic pollution in the ocean and Californias coastal environment; and
3747
3848 WHEREAS, Recognizing the negative environmental impact of plastic straws, many restaurants and other establishments in California and around the United States have voluntarily stopped providing plastic straws; and
3949
4050 WHEREAS, Customers should be encouraged to make informed choices when considering ways to reduce their impacts on the environment; and
4151
4252 WHEREAS, The California State Senate recognizes the efforts of Girl Scout Shelby ONeil, the founder of Jr Ocean Guardians, to raise awareness about the problem of ocean plastic, and to reduce pollution from plastic straws by starting the No Straw November initiative; and
4353
4454 WHEREAS, In the No Straw November initiative, participants pledge to refuse straws for the month of November; and
4555
4656 WHEREAS, Shelby ONeil attributes her love of the ocean and founding of Jr Ocean Guardians to her service as a Teen Conservation Leader at Monterey Bay Aquarium; now, therefore, be it
4757
4858 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the month of November shall be recognized as No Straw November; and be it further
4959
5060 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California and to the author for appropriate distribution.