Assembly | 08/22/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5570.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |