California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR22 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22 CHAPTER 47 Relative to Autism Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 16, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Hueso. Autism Awareness Month.This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3.5 million Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; and WHEREAS, More children are being diagnosed on the autism spectrum than ever before with diagnoses as high as one in 68 children nationally; andWHEREAS, More than 97,000 California public school students have been diagnosed as autistic; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for autism, but it is well-documented that if individuals with autism receive treatment early in their lives, it is often possible for those individuals to lead significantly improved lives; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often require a lifetime of specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support families resilience as they manage the psychological and financial burdens autism presents; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the month of April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and encourages residents to show support for autism awareness; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled May 12, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 11, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 14, 2017 Relative to Autism Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Hueso. Autism Awareness Month.This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3.5 million Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; and WHEREAS, More children are being diagnosed on the autism spectrum than ever before with diagnoses as high as one in 68 children nationally; andWHEREAS, More than 97,000 California public school students have been diagnosed as autistic; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for autism, but it is well-documented that if individuals with autism receive treatment early in their lives, it is often possible for those individuals to lead significantly improved lives; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often require a lifetime of specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support families resilience as they manage the psychological and financial burdens autism presents; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the month of April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and encourages residents to show support for autism awareness; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22 CHAPTER 47 Relative to Autism Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 16, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Hueso. Autism Awareness Month.This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled May 12, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 11, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 14, 2017 Relative to Autism Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Hueso. Autism Awareness Month.This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled May 12, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 11, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled May 12, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly May 11, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22
6-CHAPTER 47
14+
15+Introduced by Senator HuesoFebruary 14, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Hueso
18+February 14, 2017
719
820 Relative to Autism Awareness Month.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State May 16, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 22, Hueso. Autism Awareness Month.
1727
1828 This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.
1929
2030 This measure would designate April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and would encourage residents to show support for autism awareness.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, More than 3.5 million Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, More children are being diagnosed on the autism spectrum than ever before with diagnoses as high as one in 68 children nationally; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, More than 97,000 California public school students have been diagnosed as autistic; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, There is no cure for autism, but it is well-documented that if individuals with autism receive treatment early in their lives, it is often possible for those individuals to lead significantly improved lives; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, Individuals with autism often require a lifetime of specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support families resilience as they manage the psychological and financial burdens autism presents; now, therefore, be it
3747
3848 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the month of April 2017 as Autism Awareness Month and encourages residents to show support for autism awareness; and be it further
3949
4050 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.