Senate | 05/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1309.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 640.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |