Senate | 05/15/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | (Corrected May 9). | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |