California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR45 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/15/2017

                            Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 45 CHAPTER 46 Relative to peace officers.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 15, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 45, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 8, 2017, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2016:Deputy Sheriff Scott Ballantyne, Tulare County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 10, 2016.Officer Nathan Taylor, California Highway Patrol Gold Run Area, End of Watch: March 13, 2016.Officer Jonathan J.D. De Guzman, San Diego Police Department, End of Watch: July 28, 2016.Sergeant Steve Owen, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 5, 2016.Officer Jose Gilbert Gil Vega, Palm Springs Police Department, End of Watch: October 8, 2016.Officer Lesley Zerebny, Palm Springs Police Department, End of Watch: October 8, 2016.Deputy Sheriff Jack Hopkins, Modoc County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 19, 2016.Sergeant Alfonso Lopez, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 24, 2016.Deputy Sheriff Dennis Wallace, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: November 13, 2016; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled:Officer Paul M. Carlisle, Oakland Police Department, End of Watch: December 1, 2015.Sergeant Thomas J. Fonte, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 2, 1990.Deputy Marshal Frederick F. Moore, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: January 16, 1947.Constable Charles W. Winston, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: April 3, 1926.Deputy Arthur J. Solomon, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 7, 1917; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 45 CHAPTER 46 Relative to peace officers.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 15, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 45, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 45
CHAPTER 46

 Relative to peace officers. 

 [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 15, 2017. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 45, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.

This measure would designate Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.

This measure would designate Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Monday, May 8, 2017, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and

WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and

WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and

WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and

WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and

WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2016:

Deputy Sheriff Scott Ballantyne, Tulare County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 10, 2016.

Officer Nathan Taylor, California Highway Patrol Gold Run Area, End of Watch: March 13, 2016.

Officer Jonathan J.D. De Guzman, San Diego Police Department, End of Watch: July 28, 2016.

Sergeant Steve Owen, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 5, 2016.

Officer Jose Gilbert Gil Vega, Palm Springs Police Department, End of Watch: October 8, 2016.

Officer Lesley Zerebny, Palm Springs Police Department, End of Watch: October 8, 2016.

Deputy Sheriff Jack Hopkins, Modoc County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 19, 2016.

Sergeant Alfonso Lopez, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 24, 2016.

Deputy Sheriff Dennis Wallace, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: November 13, 2016; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled:

Officer Paul M. Carlisle, Oakland Police Department, End of Watch: December 1, 2015.

Sergeant Thomas J. Fonte, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 2, 1990.

Deputy Marshal Frederick F. Moore, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: January 16, 1947.

Constable Charles W. Winston, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: April 3, 1926.

Deputy Arthur J. Solomon, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 7, 1917; and be it further

Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.