Senate | 06/27/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2316.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |