1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47 CHAPTER 89 Relative to Portugal Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 27, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Mendoza. Portugal Day.This measure would declare June 10, 2017, as Portugal Day to celebrate Portuguese national heritage.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In September 1542, Portuguese explorer Joo Rodrigues Cabrillo sailed a ship into San Diego Bay, becoming the first European to explore the land now known as California. Cabrillos efforts included exploring the California coast, and he is credited with numerous coastal discoveries; and WHEREAS, Portuguese immigrants began arriving in the United States in relatively large numbers beginning in 1870, with most of these immigrants being men from the Azores, who, for the most part, had been recruited to farm and to work on American whaling ships; and WHEREAS, Between 1900 and 1940, as much as one-half of the Portuguese community in California owned or operated a dairy farm, worked on a dairy farm, or worked in a dairy-supporting industry. Applying the Portuguese belief in hard work and thriftiness, these pioneering Portuguese Americans were renowned for their work ethic and ingenuity, often reinvesting in their own businesses by buying more land and dairy cows; and WHEREAS, Among the great Portuguese Americans who have contributed significantly to this country are: composer John Philip Sousa, best known for composing The Stars and Stripes Forever; poet Emma Lazarus, best known for her sonnet about the Statue of Liberty, The New Colossus; architect William L. Pereira, best known for designing the Transamerica Pyramid in San Francisco; and singer and actress Carmen Miranda. Many Portuguese Americans have also served with distinction in local, state, and federal office; andWHEREAS, Portuguese Americans have made valuable and substantial contributions to every facet of California life, such as within the thriving agricultural communities of the Santa Clara and San Joaquin Valleys and through service in local, state, and federal office. Today over 350,000 Portuguese Americans reside in California; andWHEREAS, Portuguese national literary icon, Lus Vaz de Cames wrote Portugals national epic poem, Os Lusadas, celebrating the 15th-century Portuguese explorations that brought fame and fortune to the country. The poem, considered one of the finest and most important works in Portuguese literature, became a symbol for the great feats of the Portuguese Empire; and WHEREAS, Dia de Portugal, de Cames e das Comunidades Portuguesas, translated as Day of Portugal, Cames, and the Portuguese Communities, commemorates the death of Lus Vaz de Cames on June 10, 1580; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares June 10, 2017, as Portugal Day, a day to celebrate Portuguese national heritage; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 23, 2017 Passed IN Senate June 05, 2017 Passed IN Assembly June 22, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senator Mendoza(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Kalra)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Arambula and Gray)April 27, 2017 Relative to Portugal Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Mendoza. Portugal Day.This measure would declare June 10, 2017, as Portugal Day to celebrate Portuguese national heritage.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In September 1542, Portuguese explorer Joo Rodrigues Cabrillo sailed a ship into San Diego Bay, becoming the first European to explore the land now known as California. Cabrillos efforts included exploring the California coast, and he is credited with numerous coastal discoveries; and WHEREAS, Portuguese immigrants began arriving in the United States in relatively large numbers beginning in 1870, with most of these immigrants being men from the Azores, who, for the most part, had been recruited to farm and to work on American whaling ships; and WHEREAS, Between 1900 and 1940, as much as one-half of the Portuguese community in California owned or operated a dairy farm, worked on a dairy farm, or worked in a dairy-supporting industry. Applying the Portuguese belief in hard work and thriftiness, these pioneering Portuguese Americans were renowned for their work ethic and ingenuity, often reinvesting in their own businesses by buying more land and dairy cows; and WHEREAS, Among the great Portuguese Americans who have contributed significantly to this country are: composer John Philip Sousa, best known for composing The Stars and Stripes Forever; poet Emma Lazarus, best known for her sonnet about the Statue of Liberty, The New Colossus; architect William L. Pereira, best known for designing the Transamerica Pyramid in San Francisco; and singer and actress Carmen Miranda. Many Portuguese Americans have also served with distinction in local, state, and federal office; andWHEREAS, Portuguese Americans have made valuable and substantial contributions to every facet of California life, such as within the thriving agricultural communities of the Santa Clara and San Joaquin Valleys and through service in local, state, and federal office. Today over 350,000 Portuguese Americans reside in California; andWHEREAS, Portuguese national literary icon, Lus Vaz de Cames wrote Portugals national epic poem, Os Lusadas, celebrating the 15th-century Portuguese explorations that brought fame and fortune to the country. The poem, considered one of the finest and most important works in Portuguese literature, became a symbol for the great feats of the Portuguese Empire; and WHEREAS, Dia de Portugal, de Cames e das Comunidades Portuguesas, translated as Day of Portugal, Cames, and the Portuguese Communities, commemorates the death of Lus Vaz de Cames on June 10, 1580; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares June 10, 2017, as Portugal Day, a day to celebrate Portuguese national heritage; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|