Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 5. Page 2839.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2016
|
(Corrected January 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|