California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017