Senate | 09/01/2017 | (Ayes 23. Noes 13.) | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2017 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2284.) (August 29). | ||
Senate | 08/25/2017 | Set for hearing August 29. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |