Senate | 08/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6255.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2260.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |