1 | | - | Senate Joint Resolution No. 12 CHAPTER 165Relative to international exchange programs. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 24, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSJR 12, Wiener. Fulbright U.S. Student Program.This measure would encourage the federal government to maintain or restore full funding to integral international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, United States international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program, are vital to creating and fostering relationships with countries around the world and to the promotion of international peace and diplomacy; andWHEREAS, The current federal administration has submitted a budget proposal that, if adopted, would result in a devastating 71 percent cut to the Fulbright U.S. Student Program for fiscal year 2019; andWHEREAS, The Fulbright U.S. Student Program is the flagship international educational exchange program sponsored by the U.S. government and is designed to increase mutual understanding between the people of the United States and the people of other countries; andWHEREAS, The Fulbright U.S. Student Program was founded by United States Senator J. William Fulbright in 1946, and it is known as the gold standard in international educational exchange for students, scholars, teachers, professionals, scientists, and artists; andWHEREAS, Fulbright U.S. Student Program alumni have achieved distinction in government, science, the arts, business, philanthropy, education, and athletics; andWHEREAS, The prestigious Fulbright U.S. Student Program has helped develop 84 Pulitzer Prize winners, 59 Nobel Prize recipients, and 71 MacArthur Foundation fellows, and 37 alumni have served as heads of state or government, 10 have been elected to the United States Congress, and one has served as Secretary General of the United Nations; andWHEREAS, Many private and public California higher education institutions have excelled in preparing competitive applicants for these scholarship awards; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature encourages the federal government to maintain or restore full funding to integral international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 21, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 20, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 13, 2018 Amended IN Assembly August 06, 2018 Amended IN Assembly April 09, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Joint Resolution No. 12Introduced by Senator Wiener(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Daly, Eggman, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Weber, and Wood)August 21, 2017Relative to international exchange programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSJR 12, Wiener. Fulbright U.S. Student Program.This measure would encourage the federal government to maintain or restore full funding to integral international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, United States international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program, are vital to creating and fostering relationships with countries around the world and to the promotion of international peace and diplomacy; andWHEREAS, The current federal administration has submitted a budget proposal that, if adopted, would result in a devastating 71 percent cut to the Fulbright U.S. Student Program for fiscal year 2019; andWHEREAS, The Fulbright U.S. Student Program is the flagship international educational exchange program sponsored by the U.S. government and is designed to increase mutual understanding between the people of the United States and the people of other countries; andWHEREAS, The Fulbright U.S. Student Program was founded by United States Senator J. William Fulbright in 1946, and it is known as the gold standard in international educational exchange for students, scholars, teachers, professionals, scientists, and artists; andWHEREAS, Fulbright U.S. Student Program alumni have achieved distinction in government, science, the arts, business, philanthropy, education, and athletics; andWHEREAS, The prestigious Fulbright U.S. Student Program has helped develop 84 Pulitzer Prize winners, 59 Nobel Prize recipients, and 71 MacArthur Foundation fellows, and 37 alumni have served as heads of state or government, 10 have been elected to the United States Congress, and one has served as Secretary General of the United Nations; andWHEREAS, Many private and public California higher education institutions have excelled in preparing competitive applicants for these scholarship awards; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature encourages the federal government to maintain or restore full funding to integral international exchange programs, such as the Fulbright U.S. Student Program; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States. |
---|