California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR48 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Enrolled August 23, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, Nguyen. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, August 15, 2017, marks the 72nd anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; andWHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; andWHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2017, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, as introduced, Nguyen. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, August 15, 2017, marks the 72nd anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; andWHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; andWHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2017, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Enrolled August 23, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, Nguyen. Digest Key
3+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, as introduced, Nguyen. Digest Key
44
5- Enrolled August 23, 2017 Passed IN Senate August 21, 2017
65
7-Enrolled August 23, 2017
8-Passed IN Senate August 21, 2017
6+
7+
98
109 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
1110
1211 Senate Resolution No. 48
1312
1413 Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017
1514
1615 Introduced by Senator Nguyen
1716 July 10, 2017
1817
19- Relative to Korean Independence Day
18+ Relative to Korean Independence Day.
2019
2120 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2221
2322 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2423
25-SR 48, Nguyen.
24+SR 48, as introduced, Nguyen.
2625
2726
2827
2928 ## Digest Key
3029
3130 ## Bill Text
3231
3332 WHEREAS, August 15, 2017, marks the 72nd anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; and
3433
3534 WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; and
3635
3736 WHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and
3837
3938 WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and
4039
4140 WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and
4241
4342 WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and
4443
4544 WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and
4645
4746 WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be it
4847
4948 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2017, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it further
5049
5150 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.