California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR48 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/23/2017

                            Enrolled  August 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, Nguyen. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, August 15, 2017, marks the 72nd anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; andWHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; andWHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2017, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 48Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017 Relative to Korean Independence DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 48, Nguyen. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 23, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2017

Enrolled  August 23, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 48

Introduced by Senator NguyenJuly 10, 2017

Introduced by Senator Nguyen
July 10, 2017

 Relative to Korean Independence Day

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 48, Nguyen. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, August 15, 2017, marks the 72nd anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; and

WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; and

WHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and 

WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and 

WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and 

WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and 

WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and 

WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2017, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.