Senate
|
09/14/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1404.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|