California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Amended

Bill August 13, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill June 3, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019