|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3423.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2758.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1358.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|