California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 12, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019