|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3143.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ., GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2109.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|